THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:00:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite C12
Building C
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-6400
Fax: (416) 438-6420

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite C12
Building C
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-6400
Fax: (416) 438-6420

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BRIAN BUSHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUSHUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BRIAN BUSHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUSHUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Aug 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1982

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1981