THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:10:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department Of Oncology
Saint John Regional Hospital
P O Box 2100
Saint John New Brunswick E2L 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (506) 648-6884
Fax: (506) 648-6880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 05 Sep 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department Of Oncology
Saint John Regional Hospital
P O Box 2100
Saint John New Brunswick E2L 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (506) 648-6884
Fax: (506) 648-6880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 05 Sep 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGOT JOY BURNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGOT JOY BURNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980