THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:39:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Queen Street East
9th Floor
Suite 921
Toronto Ontario M5C 1R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5506
Fax: (416) 864-5636

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 28 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Queen Street East
9th Floor
Suite 921
Toronto Ontario M5C 1R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5506
Fax: (416) 864-5636

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 28 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACOB HARRY SCHNEIDERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNEIDERMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACOB HARRY SCHNEIDERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNEIDERMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 1981

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1974