THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:06:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 601-520 Ellesmere Road
6th Floor
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 673 9496
Fax: 416 438 0448

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 601-520 Ellesmere Road
6th Floor
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 673 9496
Fax: 416 438 0448

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAZNIN LALANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAZNIN LALANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1981

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1980