THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:34:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 Concession Street
Suite 2-1
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-0831
Fax: (905) 522-0464

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 Concession Street
Suite 2-1
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-0831
Fax: (905) 522-0464

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
13 Dec 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 13 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from January 21, 2021, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Marijane Doyle in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Doyle to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)
of
DR. MARIJANE DOYLE
(“Dr. Doyle”)
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)

A. PREAMBLE
(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Committee” means the Discipline Committee of the College;
“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
(2) I, Dr. Doyle, certificate of registration number 32966, am a member of the College.
(3) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1113304 (the “Investigation”) that raised concerns about my standard of practice in pediatric medicine.
B. UNDERTAKING
(4) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(5) Practice Restrictions
(a) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake that I will not perform any procedures below the dermis (“Surgical Procedures”) for any patient, including but not limited to circumcisions, tongue tie releases, suturing of lacerations, dermatological procedures, or surgical alteration or excision of lesions or tissue, including for the purpose of examination, treatment or diagnosis of disease, with the exception of ear piercing or removal of warts on patients over one (1) year of age.
(6) Posting a Sign
(a) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.” For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: “Dr. Doyle does not perform any surgical procedures, including circumcision, tongue tie release, suturing or dermatological procedures. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.
(b) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (6)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.”
(c) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
(d) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
(e) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (6)(b) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (6)(d).
(7) Monitoring
(a) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
(b) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(c) I, Dr. Doyle, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(d) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “B”.
C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(8) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(9) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(10) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(11) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
(12) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.
(13) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
(14) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
A College investigation was conducted following a public complaint that raised concerns about Dr. Doyle’s standard of practice in pediatric medicine. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Doyle must not perform surgical procedures, with the exception of ear piercing or removal of warts in patients over one year old.
Dr. Doyle shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Doyle does not perform any surgical procedures, including circumcision, tongue tie release, suturing or dermatological procedures. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”
D. CONSENT
(15) I, Dr. Doyle, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from January 21, 2021, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Marijane Doyle in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Doyle to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)
of
DR. MARIJANE DOYLE
(“Dr. Doyle”)
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)

A. PREAMBLE
(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Committee” means the Discipline Committee of the College;
“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
(2) I, Dr. Doyle, certificate of registration number 32966, am a member of the College.
(3) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1113304 (the “Investigation”) that raised concerns about my standard of practice in pediatric medicine.
B. UNDERTAKING
(4) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(5) Practice Restrictions
(a) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake that I will not perform any procedures below the dermis (“Surgical Procedures”) for any patient, including but not limited to circumcisions, tongue tie releases, suturing of lacerations, dermatological procedures, or surgical alteration or excision of lesions or tissue, including for the purpose of examination, treatment or diagnosis of disease, with the exception of ear piercing or removal of warts on patients over one (1) year of age.
(6) Posting a Sign
(a) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.” For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: “Dr. Doyle does not perform any surgical procedures, including circumcision, tongue tie release, suturing or dermatological procedures. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.
(b) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (6)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.”
(c) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
(d) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
(e) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (6)(b) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (6)(d).
(7) Monitoring
(a) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
(b) I, Dr. Doyle, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(c) I, Dr. Doyle, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(d) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “B”.
C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(8) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(9) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(10) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(11) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
(12) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.
(13) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
(14) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Doyle, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
A College investigation was conducted following a public complaint that raised concerns about Dr. Doyle’s standard of practice in pediatric medicine. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Doyle must not perform surgical procedures, with the exception of ear piercing or removal of warts in patients over one year old.
Dr. Doyle shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Doyle does not perform any surgical procedures, including circumcision, tongue tie release, suturing or dermatological procedures. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”
D. CONSENT
(15) I, Dr. Doyle, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 21 Jan 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Marijane Doyle to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 21, 2021:

A College investigation was conducted following a public complaint that raised concerns about Dr. Doyle’s standard of practice in pediatric medicine. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Doyle must not perform surgical procedures, with the exception of ear piercing or removal of warts in patients over one year old.

Dr. Doyle shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Doyle does not perform any surgical procedures, including circumcision, tongue tie release, suturing or dermatological procedures. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca” 
 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Jul 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 22 Oct 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 21 Jan 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Marijane Doyle to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 21, 2021:

A College investigation was conducted following a public complaint that raised concerns about Dr. Doyle’s standard of practice in pediatric medicine. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Doyle must not perform surgical procedures, with the exception of ear piercing or removal of warts in patients over one year old.

Dr. Doyle shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Doyle does not perform any surgical procedures, including circumcision, tongue tie release, suturing or dermatological procedures. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca” 
 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Jul 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 22 Oct 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 13 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. Effective: 21 Jan 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1975