THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:57:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 05 Sep 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: c/o Dr. Akyurekli, McKenna and Rassouli
Suite 216-945 Third Avenue East
Owen Sound ON N4K 2Kb
Date Received: 02 May 2017

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy/transfer of their medical record may send their request to:
Suite 216
945 Third Avenue East
Owen Sound, ON N4K 2K8
Date Received: 20 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander Marsh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jan 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 05 Sep 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: c/o Dr. Akyurekli, McKenna and Rassouli
Suite 216-945 Third Avenue East
Owen Sound ON N4K 2Kb
Date Received: 02 May 2017

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy/transfer of their medical record may send their request to:
Suite 216
945 Third Avenue East
Owen Sound, ON N4K 2K8
Date Received: 20 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander Marsh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jan 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1979