THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:08:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1975
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 25 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession St
Hamilton, ON L8V 5C2
Date Received: 24 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Benger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 25 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession St
Hamilton, ON L8V 5C2
Date Received: 24 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Benger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975


DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1975