THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:25:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Osmania University, 1962
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 13-1 High Meadow Pl
North York,ON
M9L 0A3
Date Received: 31 Mar 2021

Instructions/Address: Markham Office: Records stored at The Records Management
13-1 High Meadow Place, North York, Ontario M9L 0A3
Tel : 1-800-775-0093

Durham CAS, 320 Airport Blvd. Oshawa, Ontario L1J 0C6
Tel: (905) 433-1551
Date Received: 13 Feb 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keesari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Osmania University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 13-1 High Meadow Pl
North York,ON
M9L 0A3
Date Received: 31 Mar 2021

Instructions/Address: Markham Office: Records stored at The Records Management
13-1 High Meadow Place, North York, Ontario M9L 0A3
Tel : 1-800-775-0093

Durham CAS, 320 Airport Blvd. Oshawa, Ontario L1J 0C6
Tel: (905) 433-1551
Date Received: 13 Feb 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keesari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Osmania University, 1962

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Mar 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2021


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 1994

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 1981
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 1981

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 1972

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1968