THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:24:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1976
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who were seen by Dr. Foster at the clinic located at 219-840 Coxwell Avenue may request their medical records from: Docudavit, 28 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON, M6B 3Z4, Tel: 1-888-781-9083, Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 11 Oct 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who were seen by Dr. Foster at the clinic located at 219-840 Coxwell Avenue may request their medical records from: Docudavit, 28 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON, M6B 3Z4, Tel: 1-888-781-9083, Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 11 Oct 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 1982

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 1979

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1976