THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:59:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1975
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 09 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Powell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 09 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Powell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH POWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH POWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1982
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 1982