THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:49:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: BBBS storage 3000 Arthur St., Thunder Bay
Date Received: 01 Jun 2022

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6

Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 29 Oct 2010

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trudy Lynn Mahood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: BBBS storage 3000 Arthur St., Thunder Bay
Date Received: 01 Jun 2022

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6

Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 29 Oct 2010

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trudy Lynn Mahood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 02 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 1982