THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:21:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DOCUdavit
40 ASHWARREN RD. NORTH YORK, ON M3J 1Z5
Date Received: 26 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Kenneth Roberts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DOCUdavit
40 ASHWARREN RD. NORTH YORK, ON M3J 1Z5
Date Received: 26 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Kenneth Roberts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On October 9, 2014, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Newmarket, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. David K Roberts in respect of an incident that took place in March 2009. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On October 9, 2014, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Newmarket, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. David K Roberts in respect of an incident that took place in March 2009. 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 25 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 1982