THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:14:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 88 Heddington Ave
Toronto Ontario M5N 2K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 481-3139
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 23 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 88 Heddington Ave
Toronto Ontario M5N 2K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 481-3139
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 23 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET HING WAH PUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET HING WAH PUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 29 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 1987

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 1987

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1981