THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:40:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1975
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Alvin Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4T 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 960-8012
Fax: (416) 782-7965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 06 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Alvin Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4T 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 960-8012
Fax: (416) 782-7965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 06 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELE DIANNE HEILBUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEILBUT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELE DIANNE HEILBUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEILBUT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 1978