THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:56:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kidecare Urgent Care Clinic
491 Eglunton Ave West
Unit 301
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-860-6696
Fax: 416-848-8850

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kidecare Urgent Care Clinic
491 Eglunton Ave West
Unit 301
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-860-6696
Fax: 416-848-8850

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOHN MOUNSTEPHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUNSTEPHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOHN MOUNSTEPHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUNSTEPHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1982

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1982

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1977