THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:08:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 19 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please contact the above
[email protected]
Date Received: 31 Aug 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Guttman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Mar 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 19 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please contact the above
[email protected]
Date Received: 31 Aug 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Guttman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Mar 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 24 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2022


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1982