THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:38:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, URDU
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 18 Oct 2018
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On October 18, 2018, the Medical Board of California, with the agreement of Dr. Manzar Sarfaraz Kuraishi, made an order effective November 16, 2018 staying an order of revocation of Dr. Kuraishi’s licence and placing him on probation for three years. The terms of the probation ordered by the Medical Board of California include requirements to successfully complete approved educational programs and courses, practice under an approved practice monitor or participate in a professional enhancement program, and not supervise physician assistants or advanced practice nurses. This order was made as a result of allegations of gross negligence, repeated negligent acts, incompetence, repeated acts of excessive prescribing and inadequate and/or inaccurate record-keeping in connection with his care and treatment of a patient, and allegations of aiding and abetting a medical assistant to practice medicine without a license, failure to supervise a medical assistant, and unprofessional conduct, all of which are causes for discipline under the California Business and Professions Code. The College was notified of this finding by a report dated October 25, 2018. 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 07 Feb 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Manzar Sarfaraz Kuraishi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 7, 2017:

Dr. Kuraishi has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 18 Oct 2018
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On October 18, 2018, the Medical Board of California, with the agreement of Dr. Manzar Sarfaraz Kuraishi, made an order effective November 16, 2018 staying an order of revocation of Dr. Kuraishi’s licence and placing him on probation for three years. The terms of the probation ordered by the Medical Board of California include requirements to successfully complete approved educational programs and courses, practice under an approved practice monitor or participate in a professional enhancement program, and not supervise physician assistants or advanced practice nurses. This order was made as a result of allegations of gross negligence, repeated negligent acts, incompetence, repeated acts of excessive prescribing and inadequate and/or inaccurate record-keeping in connection with his care and treatment of a patient, and allegations of aiding and abetting a medical assistant to practice medicine without a license, failure to supervise a medical assistant, and unprofessional conduct, all of which are causes for discipline under the California Business and Professions Code. The College was notified of this finding by a report dated October 25, 2018. 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 07 Feb 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Manzar Sarfaraz Kuraishi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 7, 2017:

Dr. Kuraishi has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1982