THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:51:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 79 Doncaster Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 686-1696
Fax: (416) 686-1735

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology
Effective: 03 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 79 Doncaster Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 686-1696
Fax: (416) 686-1735

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology
Effective: 03 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS KEVIN MACFADDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACFADDEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS KEVIN MACFADDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACFADDEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979