THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:46:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Stratford Family Health Team
444 Douro St
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
Date Received: 07 May 2019

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact: Stratford Family Health Team, 444 Douro St., Stratford, ON, N5A 0E6, Tel: (519) 273-7017.
Date Received: 03 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul T. Weir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Stratford Family Health Team
444 Douro St
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
Date Received: 07 May 2019

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact: Stratford Family Health Team, 444 Douro St., Stratford, ON, N5A 0E6, Tel: (519) 273-7017.
Date Received: 03 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul T. Weir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 1982