THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:42:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Galley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jan 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Galley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jan 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 01 Oct 2017
Summary:
Dr. Galley signed an undertaking agreeing to resign from the College effective October 1, 2017, and not to apply or re-apply to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 01 Oct 2017
Summary:
Dr. Galley signed an undertaking agreeing to resign from the College effective October 1, 2017, and not to apply or re-apply to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 May 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 04 May 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 1982