THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:18:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 28 May 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 28 May 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLGA VUJOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VUJOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLGA VUJOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VUJOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981