THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:45:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Natal, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk
Unit 108
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 5768760
Fax: 519 5768768
Address: 421 Greenbrook Drive
Unit 23A
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Phone: 519 5698592
Fax: 519 5697286

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Moola (CPSO#: 41774 )
Business Address: 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 576-8760

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Natal, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk
Unit 108
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 5768760
Fax: 519 5768768
Address: 421 Greenbrook Drive
Unit 23A
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Phone: 519 5698592
Fax: 519 5697286

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Moola (CPSO#: 41774 )
Business Address: 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 576-8760

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CASSIM MOOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOOLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CASSIM MOOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOOLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Natal, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Sep 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1972
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 1988

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 1972