THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:02:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Irish Conjoint Board, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Irish Conjoint Board, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Discipline
Effective Date: 05 Sep 2006
Summary:
On September 5, 2006, Dr. David Brian Davidson entered into the following Undertaking with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

1. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, undertake to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, no later than 11:59 p.m. on September 30, 2006.

2. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a license to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

3. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, acknowledge that, in consideration for this undertaking, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee for failure to meet the standard of practice of the profession and incompetence, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated July 11, 2006.

4. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, agree that, in the event that the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practice medicine in any jurisdiction, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a discipline proceeding on the basis of breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated July 11, 2006.

5. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, hereby agree that should the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated July 11, 2006 pursuant to paragraph 4 of this undertaking, I will bear the risk of any prejudice that the passage of time might cause to my ability to make full answer and defence, and waive the right to seek any remedy on the basis of the passage of time.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Discipline
Effective Date: 05 Sep 2006
Summary:
On September 5, 2006, Dr. David Brian Davidson entered into the following Undertaking with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

1. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, undertake to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, no later than 11:59 p.m. on September 30, 2006.

2. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a license to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

3. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, acknowledge that, in consideration for this undertaking, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee for failure to meet the standard of practice of the profession and incompetence, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated July 11, 2006.

4. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, agree that, in the event that the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practice medicine in any jurisdiction, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a discipline proceeding on the basis of breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated July 11, 2006.

5. I, Dr. David Brian Davidson, hereby agree that should the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated July 11, 2006 pursuant to paragraph 4 of this undertaking, I will bear the risk of any prejudice that the passage of time might cause to my ability to make full answer and defence, and waive the right to seek any remedy on the basis of the passage of time.

Training

Medical School: Irish Conjoint Board, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Underserviced Area Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Underserviced Area Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 1977