THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:55:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 806
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 485-7749
Fax: (416) 485-7095
Address: Suite 406
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 281-3323
Fax: (416) 281-9774
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Headache Clinic
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4685
Fax: (416) 480-6885

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 07 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 806
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 485-7749
Fax: (416) 485-7095
Address: Suite 406
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 281-3323
Fax: (416) 281-9774
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Headache Clinic
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4685
Fax: (416) 480-6885

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 07 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAREK JAN GAWEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAWEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAREK JAN GAWEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAWEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 1984

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1975