THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:54:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1969
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Division Of Infectious Diseases
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5867
Fax: (416) 864-5310

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 19 Jan 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I. W. Fong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Division Of Infectious Diseases
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5867
Fax: (416) 864-5310

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 19 Jan 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I. W. Fong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IGNATIUS WELLINGTON FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IGNATIUS WELLINGTON FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1974
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 May 1993

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1976

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1974

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1970