THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:02:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Chicago, 1963
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 28 Sep 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 31 May 2018

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Chicago, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 28 Sep 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 31 May 2018

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Chicago, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 May 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 May 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 May 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 May 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 1978