THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:14:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 1961
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 21 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records can be sent to Sick Kids Hospital:

ROI-Health Information Management
Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416-813-7575
Fax: 416-813-5802

555 University Avenue
Room S203
Toronto, Ontario
M5G 1X8
Date Received: 03 Mar 2025

Instructions/Address: currently at 1711-175 Cumberland Street, Toronto, ON M5R 3M9
At some point in time to be determined, files will be archived at Papersavers, 380 Alden Road, Markham, ON L3R 4C1.
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 21 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records can be sent to Sick Kids Hospital:

ROI-Health Information Management
Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416-813-7575
Fax: 416-813-5802

555 University Avenue
Room S203
Toronto, Ontario
M5G 1X8
Date Received: 03 Mar 2025

Instructions/Address: currently at 1711-175 Cumberland Street, Toronto, ON M5R 3M9
At some point in time to be determined, files will be archived at Papersavers, 380 Alden Road, Markham, ON L3R 4C1.
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 1961

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 1979