THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:32:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Meir Steiner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Nov 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, HEBREW
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Meir Steiner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Nov 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 Aug 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 1981