THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 20:34:01 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jammu University, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 28 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Rashid Dar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jun 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Jammu University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 28 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Rashid Dar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jun 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jammu University, 1966
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
No information available

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 1992

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1982

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1974