THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:57:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1969
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Docudavit
(416) 781-9083
www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017

Instructions/Address: DOCUdavit Medical Solutions, 1 (888)-781-9083, [email protected]
Date Received: 26 Aug 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chok Ching Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Docudavit
(416) 781-9083
www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017

Instructions/Address: DOCUdavit Medical Solutions, 1 (888)-781-9083, [email protected]
Date Received: 26 Aug 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chok Ching Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 09 Mar 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Chok Ching Yee to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective March 9, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Yee’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Yee has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 09 Mar 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Chok Ching Yee to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective March 9, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Yee’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Yee has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1969

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2017


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1970

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1969