THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:25:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 301
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 298-0111
Fax: (416) 298-1574

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 28 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John J. Acker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 301
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 298-0111
Fax: (416) 298-1574

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 28 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John J. Acker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN JACOB ACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN JACOB ACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 1985

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1977