THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:40:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ghent University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FLEMISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 18 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre
at Hamilton Health Sciences
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Date Received: 18 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FLEMISH
Medical School: Ghent University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 18 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre
at Hamilton Health Sciences
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Date Received: 18 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ghent University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jan 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979