THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 03:56:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: OTTAWA GENERAL HOSPITAL
501 SMYTH ROAD
OTTAWA, ONTARIO
K1H 8L6
Date Received: 14 Jul 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trudy M. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Feb 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: OTTAWA GENERAL HOSPITAL
501 SMYTH ROAD
OTTAWA, ONTARIO
K1H 8L6
Date Received: 14 Jul 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trudy M. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Feb 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 1985

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981