THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:13:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9 Robin Hts
Dunnville ON N1A 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darrell Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9 Robin Hts
Dunnville ON N1A 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darrell Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARRELL KURT BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARRELL KURT BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1981