THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:00:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1977
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN, POLISH, PORTUGUESE, ROMANIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
Pediatric Medical Clinic
2200 Eglinton Ave. West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-4120
Fax: (905) 813-4128

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Jun 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN, POLISH, PORTUGUESE, ROMANIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
Pediatric Medical Clinic
2200 Eglinton Ave. West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-4120
Fax: (905) 813-4128

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Jun 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WANDA MARINA SZYMONOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZYMONOWICZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WANDA MARINA SZYMONOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZYMONOWICZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1977