THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:31:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 557 Paradise Cres. Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2J8
Date Received: 18 Mar 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 557 Paradise Cres. Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2J8
Date Received: 18 Mar 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Delhi, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Mar 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 1990

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1976