THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:26:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Effective Date: 21 Apr 2011
Summary:
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF PRIVILEGES: On April 25, 2011, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College that Dr. Sukhdev Singh Kooner’s privileges at Windsor Regional Hospital were suspended on an immediate and temporary basis, effective April 21, 2011.

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Effective Date: 21 Apr 2011
Summary:
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF PRIVILEGES: On April 25, 2011, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College that Dr. Sukhdev Singh Kooner’s privileges at Windsor Regional Hospital were suspended on an immediate and temporary basis, effective April 21, 2011.

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (2)

Date of Decision: 01 Aug 2008
Summary of Decision:
On August 1, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kooner to have committed acts of professional misconduct for failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and by an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine, that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. In addition, the Committee also found Dr. Kooner to be incompetent in that his care of a patient displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgement that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue in practice or that his practice should be restricted.


On November 28, 2008, the Discipline Committee ordered the following:

1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Kooner(s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, commencing January 5, 2009.

2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Kooner(s certificate of registration, as of the date of this Order:

(a) Dr. Kooner shall be prohibited from practicing allergy medicine and alternative allergy medicine. This shall not be construed as preventing Dr. Kooner from providing emergency care to a patient in an urgent situation.

3. Dr. Kooner pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,500 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.

4. The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 15, 2007

Date of Decision: 09 Jul 2001
Summary of Decision:
On July 9, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kooner guilty of professional misconduct for failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found Dr. Kooner to be incompetent in that his care of a patient displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgement that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue in practice or that his practice should be restricted.

On November 15, 2001 the Discipline Committee ordered the Registrar to revoke Dr. Kooner’s certificate of registration effective immediately.

On December 12, 2001, Dr. Kooner appealed both the decision and the penalty decision of the Discipline Committee to the Ontario Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court).

On December 27, 2001, a single judge of the Divisional Court granted Dr. Kooner’s motion to stay the penalty order on certain conditions.

The Court ordered that the Discipline Committee order of November 15, 2001, revoking Dr. Kooner’s certificate of registration in Ontario is hereby stayed pending the appeal and on the following terms:

1) That the appellant does not practice medicine in the area of allergy or any related field such as clinical ecology. He may practice in the areas of internal medicine and respirology only;

2) That there be no indication on the appellants letterhead, business cards of any other documentation of his ability to practice in the area of allergy, clinical ecology or alternative medicine related to allergy;

3) That the appellant cooperate with the College in setting up a plan of reasonable supervision for his practice as set out above;

4) That the appellant comply with the recommendations made by specified physicians insofar as they apply to general office procedures and practice;

On December 9, 2002, a panel of the Divisional Court granted Dr. Kooner’s appeal and remitted the matter to a new panel of the Discipline Committee on the condition that Dr. Kooner be restricted to practising medicine only in the fields of internal medicine and respirology and shall not practice in the area of allergy or any related field such as clinical ecology. The Court awarded Dr. Kooner $20,000 in costs and $7,688 in disbursements, plus GST.

On December 24, 2002, the College filed notice to seek leave to appeal to the Court of Appeal the order of the Divisional Court.

On March 14, 2003, the Court of Appeal granted leave to appeal.

On November 5, 2003, the Court of Appeal dismissed the Colleges appeal with costs.
 
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 2002-12-09
Hearing Date(s): 01 Nov 2000

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Apr 2015
Summary: 0

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (2)

Date of Decision: 01 Aug 2008
Summary of Decision:
On August 1, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kooner to have committed acts of professional misconduct for failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and by an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine, that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. In addition, the Committee also found Dr. Kooner to be incompetent in that his care of a patient displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgement that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue in practice or that his practice should be restricted.


On November 28, 2008, the Discipline Committee ordered the following:

1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Kooner(s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, commencing January 5, 2009.

2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Kooner(s certificate of registration, as of the date of this Order:

(a) Dr. Kooner shall be prohibited from practicing allergy medicine and alternative allergy medicine. This shall not be construed as preventing Dr. Kooner from providing emergency care to a patient in an urgent situation.

3. Dr. Kooner pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,500 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.

4. The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 15, 2007

Date of Decision: 09 Jul 2001
Summary of Decision:
On July 9, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kooner guilty of professional misconduct for failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found Dr. Kooner to be incompetent in that his care of a patient displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgement that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue in practice or that his practice should be restricted.

On November 15, 2001 the Discipline Committee ordered the Registrar to revoke Dr. Kooner’s certificate of registration effective immediately.

On December 12, 2001, Dr. Kooner appealed both the decision and the penalty decision of the Discipline Committee to the Ontario Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court).

On December 27, 2001, a single judge of the Divisional Court granted Dr. Kooner’s motion to stay the penalty order on certain conditions.

The Court ordered that the Discipline Committee order of November 15, 2001, revoking Dr. Kooner’s certificate of registration in Ontario is hereby stayed pending the appeal and on the following terms:

1) That the appellant does not practice medicine in the area of allergy or any related field such as clinical ecology. He may practice in the areas of internal medicine and respirology only;

2) That there be no indication on the appellants letterhead, business cards of any other documentation of his ability to practice in the area of allergy, clinical ecology or alternative medicine related to allergy;

3) That the appellant cooperate with the College in setting up a plan of reasonable supervision for his practice as set out above;

4) That the appellant comply with the recommendations made by specified physicians insofar as they apply to general office procedures and practice;

On December 9, 2002, a panel of the Divisional Court granted Dr. Kooner’s appeal and remitted the matter to a new panel of the Discipline Committee on the condition that Dr. Kooner be restricted to practising medicine only in the fields of internal medicine and respirology and shall not practice in the area of allergy or any related field such as clinical ecology. The Court awarded Dr. Kooner $20,000 in costs and $7,688 in disbursements, plus GST.

On December 24, 2002, the College filed notice to seek leave to appeal to the Court of Appeal the order of the Divisional Court.

On March 14, 2003, the Court of Appeal granted leave to appeal.

On November 5, 2003, the Court of Appeal dismissed the Colleges appeal with costs.
 
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 2002-12-09
Hearing Date(s): 01 Nov 2000

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Apr 2015
Summary: 0

Training

Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 16 Apr 2015
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 05 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 14 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 23 Dec 2011
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 04 Apr 2009
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 28 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 19 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee. Effective: 13 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 09 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2002
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 Nov 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2009

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2002

DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979