THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:49:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Chonnam National University, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 03 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Ra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: Chonnam National University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 03 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Ra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Chonnam National University, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979