THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 01:50:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patient medical records are being stored by: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6. Website: http://www.rsrs.com; Tel: 416-398-0638: Fax: 416-398-5932

Date Received: 30 Jun 2022

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.J.A. Dufresne Medicine Professional Corporation/M.J.A. Dufresne Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Oct 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patient medical records are being stored by: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6. Website: http://www.rsrs.com; Tel: 416-398-0638: Fax: 416-398-5932

Date Received: 30 Jun 2022

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.J.A. Dufresne Medicine Professional Corporation/M.J.A. Dufresne Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Oct 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1974
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1974

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1971