THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:46:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1976
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 09 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: St Joseph's Health Centre, Medical Records Dept
100 Westmount Rd, Guelph, Ontario N1H 5H8
Date Received: 21 Apr 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine Alderdice, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 09 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: St Joseph's Health Centre, Medical Records Dept
100 Westmount Rd, Guelph, Ontario N1H 5H8
Date Received: 21 Apr 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine Alderdice, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 21 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1980