THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:20:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 26 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Olusegun Agboola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Feb 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 26 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Olusegun Agboola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Feb 2015

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Mar 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1974
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 1991

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 1991

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 1978

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1975

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1974

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1973