THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:52:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nagpur University, 1976
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 04 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Company: 13-1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093; Fax: 1-888-316-4125
Date Received: 30 Jun 2021

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Veena Bonde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bonde (CPSO#: 50003 )
Business Address: 304 - 71 King Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2
(905) 949-1111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Nagpur University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 04 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Company: 13-1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093; Fax: 1-888-316-4125
Date Received: 30 Jun 2021

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Veena Bonde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bonde (CPSO#: 50003 )
Business Address: 304 - 71 King Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2
(905) 949-1111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VEENA UMESH BONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VEENA UMESH BONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nagpur University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1982
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 1982