THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Central de Venezuela, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Central de Venezuela, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Mar 2008
Summary:
Undertaking, effective March 11, 2008, by Dr. Gonzalo Araujo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (Note: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
(1) I, DR. GONZALO ARAUJO, undertake to resign from the College immediately. (2)I undertake to never apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practice medicine in Ontario or in any other jurisdiction in Canada. (3) I undertake to notify the College if I ever apply for a licence to practice medicine in any jurisdiction outside Canada. (4) I acknowledge that, in exchange for this Undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated September 12, 2007, for engaging in sexual impropriety with a patient and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in respect of a patient, and also to discontinue its outstanding Registrar’s investigation. (5) By entering into this Undertaking, I do not admit any of the allegations and deny all of the allegations.( 6) I agree that should the College become aware that I have: (a) applied for a licence to practice medicine in any jurisdiction in Canada; or (b) failed to notify the College of my application for a licence to practice medicine in any other jurisdiction, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the prosecution of the above-noted allegations and shall have the right to proceed with the above-noted investigation. (7) I acknowledge that any breach of this undertaking may constitute professional misconduct.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Mar 2008
Summary:
Undertaking, effective March 11, 2008, by Dr. Gonzalo Araujo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (Note: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
(1) I, DR. GONZALO ARAUJO, undertake to resign from the College immediately. (2)I undertake to never apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practice medicine in Ontario or in any other jurisdiction in Canada. (3) I undertake to notify the College if I ever apply for a licence to practice medicine in any jurisdiction outside Canada. (4) I acknowledge that, in exchange for this Undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated September 12, 2007, for engaging in sexual impropriety with a patient and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in respect of a patient, and also to discontinue its outstanding Registrar’s investigation. (5) By entering into this Undertaking, I do not admit any of the allegations and deny all of the allegations.( 6) I agree that should the College become aware that I have: (a) applied for a licence to practice medicine in any jurisdiction in Canada; or (b) failed to notify the College of my application for a licence to practice medicine in any other jurisdiction, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the prosecution of the above-noted allegations and shall have the right to proceed with the above-noted investigation. (7) I acknowledge that any breach of this undertaking may constitute professional misconduct.

Training

Medical School: Universidad Central de Venezuela, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 11 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 1993

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978