THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:23:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 26 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may put their request in writing to Dr. Butters at:
60 Arnold Avenue
Thornhill ON L4J 1B3.
Date Received: 10 Aug 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Butters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 26 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may put their request in writing to Dr. Butters at:
60 Arnold Avenue
Thornhill ON L4J 1B3.
Date Received: 10 Aug 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Butters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 16 Nov 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Ernest Butters to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 16, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Butters engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his urological practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Butters must not perform any surgical or operative procedures except vasectomies.

Dr. Butters shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Butters must not perform any surgical or operative procedures except vasectomies. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 16 Nov 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Ernest Butters to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 16, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Butters engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his urological practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Butters must not perform any surgical or operative procedures except vasectomies.

Dr. Butters shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Butters must not perform any surgical or operative procedures except vasectomies. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jan 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 27 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1979