THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Walkerville Medical Centre
Suite 110
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8W 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 252-9196
Fax: (519) 252-0375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 10 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: OMAR E.M. ABDALLAH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Abdallah (CPSO#: 50043 )
Business Address: 110-2425 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8W 1E6
519-252-9196 Extn: 1

Corporation Name: Omar E.M. Abdallah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Walkerville Medical Centre
Suite 110
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8W 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 252-9196
Fax: (519) 252-0375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 10 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: OMAR E.M. ABDALLAH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Abdallah (CPSO#: 50043 )
Business Address: 110-2425 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8W 1E6
519-252-9196 Extn: 1

Corporation Name: Omar E.M. Abdallah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR ELFAROUK MOHAMMED ABDALLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDALLAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR ELFAROUK MOHAMMED ABDALLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDALLAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 1982