THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:16:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN, PORTUGUESE, ROMANIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact Records
Management Ltd.

Telephone: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 20 Jun 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN, PORTUGUESE, ROMANIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact Records
Management Ltd.

Telephone: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 20 Jun 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 16 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982