THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:22:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd. Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordsregistry.ca or 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 27 Jul 2020

Instructions/Address: Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd.
Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free:
1-800-775-0093

www.recordsregistry.ca

or

13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd. Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordsregistry.ca or 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 27 Jul 2020

Instructions/Address: Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd.
Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free:
1-800-775-0093

www.recordsregistry.ca

or

13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 27 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1978