THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:08:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dacca Medical College, 1972
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z. Y. Alam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, URDU
Medical School: Dacca Medical College, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z. Y. Alam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dacca Medical College, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 19 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 1988

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1982