THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:22:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Jacobs Pain Centre
Suite 102
8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 305-9484
Fax: (905) 305-7381
Address: Scarborough North Multidisciplinary
Assessment Centre
P H 12
4168 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 5H6
Phone: (416) 321-0890
Fax: (416) 321-0991
Address: Pain & Disability Assessment Centre
Unit 10
4646 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5S4
Phone: (416) 640-5799
Fax: (416) 512-6375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Alpert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Jacobs Pain Centre
Suite 102
8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 305-9484
Fax: (905) 305-7381
Address: Scarborough North Multidisciplinary
Assessment Centre
P H 12
4168 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 5H6
Phone: (416) 321-0890
Fax: (416) 321-0991
Address: Pain & Disability Assessment Centre
Unit 10
4646 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5S4
Phone: (416) 640-5799
Fax: (416) 512-6375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Alpert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN ALPERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALPERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN ALPERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALPERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 26 Aug 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 1991

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982