THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:20:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1371 Neilson Road
Suite 311
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 282-5557
Fax: (416) 282-3930

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1371 Neilson Road
Suite 311
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 282-5557
Fax: (416) 282-3930

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS HOWARD ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS HOWARD ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981